+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor