+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor