+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor