+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Amendment withdrawn
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor