+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/18
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor