+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate