+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate