+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate