+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor