+ − Actions (40)
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor