+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor