+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (68)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/17/2019
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/16/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor