+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor