+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor