+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (74)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor