+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor