+ − Actions (41)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate