+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate