+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Co-author authorized
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate