+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor