+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/8/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/14/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor