+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate