+ − Actions (52)
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor