+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/13/2019
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/8/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor