+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Rereferred to committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor