+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Withdrawn from schedule
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Correction in referral
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor