+ − Actions (39)
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor