+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate