+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (81)
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Appropriations
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor