+ − Actions (48)
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor