+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate