+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate