+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/30/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor