+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor