+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/14/2019
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/10/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor