+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor