+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate