+ − Actions (35)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate