+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (70)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/5/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor