+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor