+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor