+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate