+ − Actions (39)
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Point of order sustained
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor