+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor