+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor