+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (72)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/15
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
- Read first time
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate