+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor