+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor