+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in formal meeting
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/4/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor