+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate